SHERWELL UNITED CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity provides regular religious worship. Times during the week when the church is open for quiet prayer and somewhere to withdraw from busy lives for a short time. Facilities for organisations to use the premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 12 June 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ALISTAIR LOWE | Chair | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Stevens | Trustee | 09 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rees | Trustee | 09 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH PELLOW | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kalas | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER JOYCE BRUMPTON | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL COOKE | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MORTIMORE | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE GERRY | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SOWDEN | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.72k | £107.87k | £83.85k | £94.20k | £134.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.02k | £126.55k | £152.34k | £85.32k | £119.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 February 2023 | 587 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 February 2023 | 587 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 MAY 2011 as amended on 10 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNION WITH AND ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OTHERWISE CALLED THE REFORMED EPISCOPAL CHURCH CONTAINED WITHIN THE DECLARATION OF PRINCIPLES AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sherwell Church Lodge
North Hill
Plymouth
PL4 8ER
- Phone:
- 01752266163
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window