Financial history CHOK EDUCATION

Charity Number: 1170786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/12/2020 15/12/2021 15/12/2022 15/12/2023 15/12/2024
Total gross income £1.56k £2.27k £2.25k £2.21k £1.34k
Total expenditure £1.76k £3.12k £2.54k £1.72k £1.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A