CHOK EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to advance the education of the Maya people, in particular but not exclusively Central America, in such ways as the charity trustees think fit, including by providing grants to schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Belize
- Bolivia
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- Guatemala
- Honduras
- India
- Mexico
- Peru
Governance
- 16 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DIANE DAVIES PHD | Chair | 11 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK WOOLLEY | Trustee | 28 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PETTS | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/12/2020 | 15/12/2021 | 15/12/2022 | 15/12/2023 | 15/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.56k | £2.27k | £2.25k | £2.21k | £1.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.76k | £3.12k | £2.54k | £1.72k | £1.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 December 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 December 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 December 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 December 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 December 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE MAYA PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CENTRAL AMERICA, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bwthyn am Byth
Bwlch Y Gwynt Road
Llysfaen
COLWYN BAY
Clwyd
LL29 8DQ
- Phone:
- 07703436398
- Email:
- chokeducation@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window