Financial history LEVELS

Charity number: 1170752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.00k £16 £109 £4.94k £335
Total expenditure £1.09k £107 £2.32k £3.62k £1.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A £4.81k N/A