LEVELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"LEVELS" was established as a CIO in 2016 by Hull Churches Housing Association, for the provision of additional community development activities. It provides the hub for social cohesion,community development and prevention of social isolation, to improve the quality of life for tenants of Hull Churches Housing Association and local residents throughout the city of Kingston upon Hull.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 14 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Petronella van der Zande | Chair | 12 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Karen Michelle Tozer | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kial-Leigh Sigsworth | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tia Scutt | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £16 | £109 | £4.94k | £335 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | £107 | £2.32k | £3.62k | £1.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | £4.81k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS: (1) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITIES AND SKILLS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECONOMICALLY AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF THE CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL [AND THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE] WITH A HIGH PERCENTAGE OF SOCIAL HOUSING (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND IN PARTICULAR, [BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY] INDIVIDUALS ARE WHO TENANTS OF HULL CHURCHES HOUSING ASSOCIATION (TENANTS OF HCHA) IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS, AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND (2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR, [BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY] INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE TENANTS OF HCHA FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR, [BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY] INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE TENANTS OF HCHA WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CIO SHALL THINK FIT; AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF AN ECONOMICALLY AND SOCIALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY. (3) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT AMONGST INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR, [BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY] INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE TENANTS OF HCHA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CIO SHALL THINK FIT INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, RE-TRAINING, VOLUNTEERING AND WORK EXPERIENCE OPPORTUNITIES AND ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; AND (4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR, [BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY] INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE TENANTS OF HCHA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEVELS (HULL CHURCHES HOUSING ASS.)
Studio 701
17 Princess Street
Hull
HU2 8BJ
- Phone:
- 01482210842
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window