Financial history DEBRE-BRHAN KIDIST SELASSIE

Charity number: 1169493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £46.54k £50.17k £80.64k £63.63k £52.47k
Total expenditure £18.14k £57.19k £50.38k £18.47k £32.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A