DEBRE-BRHAN KIDIST SELASSIE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS AND COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 05 October 2016: CIO registration
- ERITREAN ORTHODOX CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV BEREKET TASFAZGHI GHEBRE | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
BERHANE TEFFERI | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
GERENSIE TESFAMICHAEL | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.54k | £50.17k | £80.64k | £63.63k | £52.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.14k | £57.19k | £50.38k | £18.47k | £32.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 February 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 February 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 April 2023 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 April 2023 | 169 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2022 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2022 | 325 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2021 | 293 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2021 | 293 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN LEEDS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE ERITREAN ORTHODOX CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Debrebrhan Qdst Slasie Eritrean Orthodox Church
200 Dewsbury Road
LEEDS
LS11 6ER
- Phone:
- 07941522560
- Email:
- YITE2009@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window