DIYA'S (CARDIFF) LIMITED

Charity number: 1172900
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MAKING GRANTS AND PROVIDING A DROP-IN FACILITY OFFERING THESE PEOPLE A SAFE SPACE WHERE THEY CAN MEET, SOCIALISE AND OBTAIN ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO HELP WITH PROBLEMS THEY ARE ENCOUNTERING IN AND AROUND CAERPHILLY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS:- 1.THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND 3.THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2020

Total income: £2,200
Total expenditure: £6,902

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 May 2017: Standard registration
  • 25 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 29/02/2020
Total gross income £2.98k £2.20k
Total expenditure £1.40k £6.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 January 2020 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required