Financial history FINMERE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS (CIO)

Charity number: 1168895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £7.17k £13.97k £22.78k £8.44k £8.07k
Total expenditure £4.34k £4.87k £5.76k £11.53k £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £21.38k £1.00k N/A