KAIROS CONNEXION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Kx Statement of Beliefs in such parts of the United Kingdom and the world as the Trustees may from time to time think fit and in particular through the provision of support and training to leaders and churches and to fulfil such other purposes which are exclusively charitable and are connected with the charitable work of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 September 2016: CIO registration
- 06 December 2023: Funds received from 1151386 EMMAUS LEADERSHIP
- KX (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Carey | Chair | 05 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
Jennie Taylor | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev DAVID ANDREW BROWN | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
JEFF LOTHAMER | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Jennifer Wickham | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Ceri Harris | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Benjamin Askew | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
DR NIC HARDING | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.47k | £79.43k | £79.50k | £84.84k | £71.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.24k | £76.27k | £71.39k | £79.68k | £72.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND TRAINING TO LEADERS AND CHURCHES AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Haydock Road
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX26 1BG
- Phone:
- 07712816677
- Email:
- info@kairosconnexion.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window