PENRITH MUSIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of 6 professional concerts, occasional educational concerts and members activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 05 February 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN MARSTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Brian Doyle | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Trevor Austen Davis | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Noriko Moffat | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Linford | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
FIONA GRAVIL | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BEXLEY UPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.38k | £4.06k | £11.53k | £17.13k | £16.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.54k | £3.11k | £17.76k | £15.74k | £15.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 9 NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, IN THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tree Tops
Garnett Bridge
KENDAL
Cumbria
LA8 9AZ
- Phone:
- 01539 823924
- Email:
- tadavis47@outlook.com
- Website:
-
penrithmusicclub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window