SOUTH NUTFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SNCS is a community choir that rehearses and performs live choral music. We provide opportunities for all who wish to participate in choral singing and to benefit from the many positive effects of singing together. We rehearse on Monday evenings between September and May with our next concert in December 2023. We offer free choir membership and concert tickets to guests from Ukraine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 August 2016: Standard registration
- SNCS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Anne Denchfield | Chair | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Nigel Roberts | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lucia Jane Denny | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Deirdre Waddington | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Arnold | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JESSIE WAYLAND | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|||||
PETER DAVIES | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.06k | £3.78k | £4.29k | £8.12k | £12.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.09k | £3.60k | £4.51k | £7.63k | £10.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAR 2015 as amended on 23 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC BY THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND PUBLIC PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL WORKS, AND BY OTHER SUCH WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Abinger Drive
REDHILL
RH1 6SZ
- Phone:
- 01737 761275
- Email:
- sncscontact@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window