NEW HORIZONS COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROCLAIM AND FURTHER THE GOSPEL OF GOD, AND PREACH AND TEACH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; RELIEF OF PERSONS IN CONDITION OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UK OR THE WORLD; ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE DIRECTORS MAY THINK FIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Germany
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 19 September 2016: Standard registration
- New Horizons Church (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WADDELL | Chair | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Coles | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Gaulton | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.28k | £251.42k | £248.49k | £299.69k | £333.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.64k | £226.46k | £189.48k | £319.80k | £346.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROCLAIM AND FURTHER THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON, JESUS CHRIST, AND TO PREACH AND TEACH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UK OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UK OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT. (3) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 RANULF CROFT
COVENTRY
CV3 5FB
- Phone:
- 02476678282
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window