THE HULL (NORTH BRANSHOLME) PHOENIX PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation has been set up as a CIO registered charity, whose objectives are to bring about community cohesion through working primarily with the residents of the North Bransholme Community and the surrounding wards. The work undertaken is without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 08 July 2016: CIO registration
- 22 June 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- 22 June 2022: Funds transferred to 1174051 ILKLEY MANOR HOUSE TRUST
- THE HULL (NORTH BRANHOLME) PHOENIX PROJECT (Previous name)
- THE HULL (NORTH BRANSHOLME) PHOENIX PROJECT (Previous name)
- THE HULL(NORTH BRANSHOLME)PHOENIX PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.68k | £29.86k | £58.37k | £56.30k | £55.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.29k | £29.33k | £41.33k | £53.84k | £72.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | £1.00k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 08 JUL 2016 AMENDED ON 14 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF NORTH BRANHOLMES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window