ARMED FORCES COMMUNITY SUPPORT HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A one stop shop to support the armed forces community in Warrington and the Cheshire area. This includes all veterans, early service leavers, reservists and their families from all three armed forces.This includes working with appropriate service providers, agencies,organisations and charities that assist military personnel. We also forge close links with NHS trusts in our area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 22 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Worrod | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Chandler | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.89k | £85.21k | £106.38k | £67.95k | £70.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.01k | £64.73k | £87.51k | £113.70k | £75.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.69k | N/A | £7.51k | £8.78k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 June 2022 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 June 2022 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Jul 2016 as amended on 11 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A SERVING SERVICE MAN AND WOMAN OF ALL THREE SERVICES INCLUDING THE RESERVES. VETERANS OF ANY ERA OR AGE, AS DEFINED BY GOVERNMENT AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILY, HUSBAND, WIFE OR PARTNER AND ANY DEPENDANTS. THIS INCLUDES ADULT INSTRUCTORS OF THE CADET FORCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Veteran Support Centre
Off Alder Lane
Warrington
WA2 8AG
- Phone:
- 01925638515
- Email:
- admin@afcsh.org
- Website:
-
AFCSH.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window