Financial history ST JUST COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1170142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.47k £10 £285 £210 £280
Total expenditure £2.13k £274 £245 £357 £953
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A