Financial history 3RD BOSTON (FISHTOFT) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 508366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.59k £14.04k £8.67k £22.13k £13.10k
Total expenditure £9.44k £6.13k £5.82k £14.81k £16.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £2.67k N/A