GLAMSCI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GlamSci provides a wide range of services for learners, including hands-on STEM workshops and demonstration days, CV and careers advice, dedicated UCAS support and personal statement checking, mentoring, placement schemes and more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy King | Chair | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amma Frimpong-Manso | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Caine | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anita Sangha | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ALAN CHURCH | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE KING | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14k | £609 | £682 | £154 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60k | £81 | £506 | £106 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATHEMATICAL (STEM) DISCIPLINES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSVELY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY YOUNG WOMEN AND DISADVANTAGED YOUNG MEN, FROM POORER BACKGROUNDS AND THOSE IN GANGS, WHO WOULD NOT NORMALLY ENGAGE IN STEM SUBJECTS BY THE PROVISION OF STEM FOCUSED EVENTS AND A CHANCE TO CHANGE THEIR LIFE THROUGH SCIENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 365
BEXLEYHEATH
KENT
DA7 9JS
DA7 9JS
- Phone:
- 07572786941
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window