RIVER REEVES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The awarding of bursaries to students beginning HE or level 3 courses within the arts. Mental Health Support across schools. Fundraising to support the awarding of bursaries through income derived from: 1) RivFest - annual music festival 2) Riv's Runners - fundraising events supported by Warrington's running community 3) Vintage Viola - a charity shop run solely by the volunteer community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £45,093 from 9 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Warrington
Governance
- 17 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEN DUNNE | Chair | 17 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Christopher Neil Bye | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Estella Rose Margaret Judson | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.56k | £61.40k | £63.89k | £98.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.38k | £46.43k | £63.03k | £49.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £45.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN WARRINGTON IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. 2. PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION WITHIN MUSIC AND THE ARTS, TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO A LINKED OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 The Mall
WARRINGTON
WA1 1QE
- Phone:
- 01625546610
- Email:
- THOMAS.FOX@UMBRELLA.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window