THE FOREST HERMITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE BUDDHISM BY THE TEACHING OF BUDDHISM AND PROVIDING A RESIDENTIAL CENTRE OR CENTRES FOR BHIKKHUS TO TEACH AND PRACTICE BUDDHISM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 18 May 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nilar Win | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Donald Cook | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Robert Bryan Yellowhammer | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Antony James Harfield | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chamila Nayani Wimalka Udagedara Mudiyanselage | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.33k | £75.47k | £127.22k | £79.75k | £42.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.89k | £49.46k | £53.13k | £60.38k | £63.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 MAR 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA (BUDDHA SASANA) BY: A) PROVIDING, MAINTAINING AND SUPPORTING, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE THERAVADA VINAYA, RESIDENTIAL ESTABLISHMENTS FOR A MONASTIC SANGHA OF PERSONS WHO HAVE UNDERTAKEN THE RULES OF TRAINING (SIKKHAPADA); AND B) SUPPORTING LAY PEOPLE IN THE PRACTICE OF THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA C) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DECIDED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOREST HERMITAGE
FULBROOK LANE
LOWER FULBROOK
WARWICK
CV35 8AS
- Phone:
- 01926 624385
- Website:
-
foresthermitage.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window