SONGBOUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Songbound is an outreach initiative that brings the transformative power of music to children in Mumbai. In cooperation with local partners Songbound sets up and sustains choirs that rehearse weekly in a safe environment, in preparation for performances throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 28 November 2016: CIO registration
- 04 December 2019: Funds received from 1112757 THE CHOIR OF LONDON TRUST
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVER WILLIAM HUNT | Chair | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nina Kanter | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ratna Jagathi Merugumalla | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH WALTERS | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/07/2020 | 11/07/2021 | 11/07/2022 | 11/07/2023 | 11/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.97k | £1.76k | £1.75k | £611 | £331 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.33k | £4.29k | £582 | £493 | £487 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 July 2024 | 10 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2024 | 10 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 July 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 July 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 July 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING THE UNDERSTANDING, APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MUSIC BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF REGULAR AND ON-GOING CHORAL WORKSHOP AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN IN INDIA AND SRI LANKA; B) THE PROVISION OF PROFESSIONAL TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR ADULT CHOIR LEADERS IN INDIA AND SRI LANKA; C) THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOP AND LEADERSHIP OPPORTUNITIES IN INDIA AND SRI LANKA FOR MUSICIANS FROM THE U.K.; D) THE PROVISION OF A BROAD AND NON-DENOMINATIONAL CURRICULUM OF VARIED MUSIC FROM AROUND THE GLOBE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 OAK HALL ROAD
LONDON
E11 2JT
- Phone:
- 07967095775
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window