Financial history Northumberland Dog Rescue

Charity Number: 1170022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £186.67k £112.12k £117.94k £100.22k £174.77k
Total expenditure £207.49k £110.40k £118.99k £118.45k £172.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £28.11k N/A N/A N/A