KYLE'S GOAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide rehabilitation & education in Wales for children and young people with acquired brain injury through contracting with statutory agencies, awareness raising, campaigning, advocacy, education and service provision. To benefit children & young people with acquired head injury, their families, partner agencies and the wider community affected by brain injury in children and young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cardiff
Governance
- 16 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Wools | Chair | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
K. SEAL | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
D. SIMMONS | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
M. ANZANI | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
S. O'SHAUGHNESSY | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
A.SMITH | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
M. MORFEY | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
M. HANCOCK | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.47k | £184 | £6.93k | £23.07k | £444 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.25k | £1.86k | £521 | £12.84k | £323 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 March 2022 | 316 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 March 2022 | 316 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF, AND TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURIES, NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS AND PHYSICAL AND LEARNING DIFFICULTIES LIVING IN WALES AND SURROUNDING REGIONS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 LLANDETTY ROAD
CARDIFF
CF5 3BT
- Phone:
- 02920098498
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window