THE FITZWYGRAM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide bursary grants to Hampton School Trust (Charity Number 1120005) for pupils attending the Schools within the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 July 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raghav Ghai | Chair | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darryll Li-Ming Coates | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Ellis | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Hedger | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shalina Crossley | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edward David Patterson MA | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Turquand Watson BA | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Justine Hamilton | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Ranjan Gadsby Basannavar PhD | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR RONALD GIBBONS | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER BAKER | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £620.24k | £774.98k | £699.20k | £649.63k | £281.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.48k | £296.34k | £400.76k | £493.79k | £527.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £584.42k | £709.82k | £645.35k | £551.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £35.82k | £65.16k | £53.86k | £97.98k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £55.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £207.25k | £296.25k | £400.69k | £493.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £225 | £90 | £69 | £440 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £206.27k | £293.30k | £399.87k | £491.66k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £69 | £440 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 MAR 2016 as amended on 08 Sep 2021 as amended on 24 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
3.1. The objects of the Charity are to advance education by providing grants exclusively to fund scholarships at Hampton School (School) for pupils who meet the academic (or other non-financial) entrance requirements for the School but would not otherwise be able to attend by reason of financial need, provided that on and with effect from the occurrence of a Trigger Event, the objects shall be to advance education by: 3.1.1 providing or assisting in the provision of scholarships at any school or schools which the Trustees in their absolute discretion consider possess a similar ethos and aims to those of the School prior to the Trigger Event; and 3.1.2 where the Trustees are satisfied that sufficient provision has been made under 3.1.1, providing financial support to enable secondary school age pupils to pursue formal education in such manner as the Trustees may in their absolute discretion determine 22.1. In these Articles: Trigger Event: means an event which is deemed to have occurred if the School: (a) gives written notice of resignation as a member; (b) makes an arrangement or composition with its creditors; (c) ceases to exist; (d) ceases to operate as a school which charges fees as a condition of pupil attendance; (e) ceases to operate on a non-profit basis; and/or (f) is ultimately owned or controlled by an entity which does not operate on a non-profit basis. School: means Hampton School
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAMPTON SCHOOL
HANWORTH ROAD
HAMPTON
TW12 3HD
- Phone:
- 02089790476
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window