THE CULTURAL SANCTUARIES FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the CSF are to create a global series of cultural sanctuaries that protect threatened cultures and languages and to protect threatened biodiversity. The CSF's plans are to create one to two Cultural Sanctuaries per year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Bhutan
- Canada
- Colombia
- Ecuador
- Guyana
- Kiribati
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Suriname
Governance
- 26 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRAVIS LEE PRICE FAIA | Chair | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLIVIA MCKENDRICK | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RILEY | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.71k | £68.40k | £56.46k | £135.99k | £27.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.80k | £95.06k | £69.92k | £89.16k | £85.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE ONLY OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO FACILITATE, PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE CREATION AND MAINTENANCE OF CULTURAL SANCTUARIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, BY: 1 PROMOTING THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY FACILITATING, PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE CREATION OF DESIGNATED NATIONAL PARKS (TO BE KNOWN AS CULTURAL SANCTUARIES) IN AREAS CONTAINING UNIQUE OR IMPORTANT BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY AND IN WHICH INDIGENOUS PEOPLE LIVE IN TRADITIONAL COMMUNITIES; 2 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND OF THOSE LIVING IN TRADITIONAL INDIGENOUS COMMUNITIES IN AREAS DESIGNATED AS CULTURAL SANCTUARIES) ON THE TRADITIONAL KNOWLEDGE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF SUCH INDIGENOUS PEOPLE BY PROMOTING THE CAPTURE AND STUDY OF TRADITIONAL KNOWLEDGE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE AND COLLATING AND CURATING IT SO THAT IT IS AVAILABLE AS A RESOURCE BOTH FOR INDIGENOUS COMMUNITIES AND FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL TO FACILITATE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO INDIGENOUS KNOWLEDGE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE; 3 PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT (MEANING DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS) BY: 3.1 THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN AND AROUND AREAS DESIGNATED AS CULTURAL SANCTUARIES AND THE PROMOTION OF THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES BY THE INDIGENOUS COMMUNITIES LIVING WITHIN THEM; AND 3.2 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; 4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED INDIGENOUS COMMUNITIES LIVING IN CULTURAL SANCTUARIES BY PROMOTING, SUPPORTING OR FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ANY OTHER NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE MEMBERS OF SUCH INDIGENOUS COMMUNITIES TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Cinnabar Wharf West
22 Wapping High Street
London
E1W 1NJ
- Phone:
- 07956534960
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window