VISION RESCUE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Education/training The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty Human Rights/Racial Harmony/Equality
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 09 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN MARK SIMPSON | Chair | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Niblock | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Cocking | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Del Manning | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Norman | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
NALISHEBO KAY ELLIOTT | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.12k | £69.50k | £98.84k | £40.74k | £45.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.79k | £41.41k | £95.23k | £55.64k | £50.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 APR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 JUL 2016 as amended on 22 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE: (1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS, PARTICULARLY (THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY) ORPHANS, STREET CHILDREN, SLUM-DWELLERS AND REFUGEES, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK OR HOMELESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED BY SUCH CONDITIONS IN INDIA (PARTICULARLY IN MUMBAI) AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (2) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN, WOMEN AND OTHER DISADVANTAGED AND/OR MARGINALISED PERSONS IN INDIA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG CHILDREN, WOMEN AND OTHER UNDERPRIVILEGED AND/OR MARGINALISED PERSONS IN INDIA, AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MOBILE MEDICAL UNITS, MEDICAL CENTRES AND ESTABLISHMENTS INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vision Rescue UK - Soul Church Ltd
4-7 Mason Road
NORWICH
NR6 6RF
- Phone:
- 01603 488880
- Email:
- jon@visionrescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window