BREAST CANCER AWARENESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BREAST CANCER AWARENESS PROMOTES AND PROTECTS THE GOOD HEALTH OF MEN AND WOMEN BY: - RAISING AWARENESS OF PRIMARY SYMPTOMS OF BREAST CANCER BOTH IN FEMALES AND ESPECIALLY IN MALES, AS THERE IS A LOW AWARENESS OF BREAST CANCER IN MALES, THAT NEEDS TO BE ADDRESSED; - PROMPTING SCREENING AND DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION ABOUT SERVICES AVAILABLE WITH THE INTENTION OF ENCOURAGING EARLY DIAGNOSIS.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FARAH SHAKEEL POWELL | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARIYA MAHON | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 279 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 279 days | |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 645 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 645 days | |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1010 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1010 days | |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1375 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1375 days | |
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1740 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1740 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF MEN AND WOMEN BY:- - RAISING AWARENESS OF PRIMARY SYMPTOMS OF BREAST CANCER BOTH IN FEMALES AND ESPECIALLY IN MALES, AS THERE IS A LOW AWARENESS OF BREAST CANCER IN MALES, THAT NEEDS TO BE ADDRESSED; - PROMPTING SCREENING AND DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION ABOUT SERVICES AVAILABLE WITH THE INTENTION OF ENCOURAGING EARLY DIAGNOSIS; - BUILDING A CULTURE WHERE EMBARRASSMENT DOES NOT PREVENT MALES AND FEMALES FROM ADDRESSING PROBLEMS AND CAPTURE ATTENTION TO THE IMPORTANCE OF EARLY DETECTION OF BREAST CANCER VIA WEBSITE, EVENTS AND MEDIA; - ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CANCER BY RAISING AWARENESS OF EARLY CANCER SYMPTOMS, ITS DETECTION, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT; AND - PROMOTING AND PROTECTING THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CANCER, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUCH SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kemp House
152-160 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07765366512
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window