EAST END CONNECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote social and cultural inclusion in London Borough of Tower Hamlets and in particular, Whitechapel, Stepney and Wapping areas and in particular: (a) prevent disadvantaged people from becoming socially excluded, (b) promote social inclusion through increasing opportunities for all regardless of backgrounds, (c) support the socially excluded to re-integrate them into mainstream society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 04 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamal Uddin Ahmed | Chair | 27 July 2016 |
|
|||||
SHAHARUL ALOM | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL KHALAM ALI | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|||||
BODRUL ALOM M.SC. | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £9.99k | £0 | £0 | £42.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.65k | £5.44k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 February 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL AND CULTURAL INCLUSION IN LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND IN PARTICULAR, WHITECHAPEL, STEPNEY AND WAPPING AREAS, THROUGH INITIATIVES TO HELP: (A) PREVENT DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, (B) PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION THROUGH INCREASING OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL REGARDLESS OF BACKGROUNDS, (C) SUPPORT THE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO RE-INTEGRATE THEM INTO MAINSTREAM SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LG Floor offices
46 Myrdle Street
London
E1 1HL
- Phone:
- 02032460035
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window