THE HASLEMERE PENNY HA'PENNY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Haslemere Penny Ha'penny Trust is a GRANT making Trust for Community Organisations in the Haslemere (Surrey) area. The Trust will have specific projects each year that it considers will benefit the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM CARTER | Chair | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jerome Michael Frances Davidson | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Ian McMichael | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Edwards | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Rosemary Robini | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Kevin Jon Whiteley | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Paul McMillan Dear | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|||||
JOHN STUART ORR | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||
REV RICHARD TALBOT BODLE | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.15k | £6.80k | £4.64k | £14.32k | £2.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.54k | £17.20k | £7.87k | £10.54k | £5.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Sep 2016 as amended on 08 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF HASLEMERE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: • CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. • VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOWN HALL
HIGH STREET
HASLEMERE
GU27 2HG
- Phone:
- 01428654305
- Email:
- admin@thehpht.org.uk
- Website:
-
thehpht.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window