Financial history FRIENDS OF THE GAMBIA ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1171620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £45.92k £45.92k £44.99k £36.08k £39.59k
Total expenditure £44.08k £44.08k £38.44k £43.10k £36.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A