STANNEY GRANGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stanney Grange Community Centre is on Stanney Grange housing estate. The Community centre is available for one off and regular community activities run by the community for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 18 September 1979: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 July 2009: Standard registration
- STANNEY GRANGE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Violet Albino | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Evans | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.75k | £382 | £0 | £10.10k | £49.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.27k | £5.59k | £1.87k | £11.42k | £48.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 August 2022 | 547 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 DECEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 21 AUGUST 1979, 28 JUNE 1993 AND 8 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF ELLESMERE PORT AND NESTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
ELLESMERE PORT AND NESTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALNWICK DRIVE
STANNEY GRANGE
ELLESMERE PORT
CHESHIRE
CH65 9HE
- Phone:
- 01515120293
- Email:
- Bookingssgcc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window