DOBERMANN RESCUE U.K & EUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescuing, rehabilitating and rehoming Dobermanns in need. We keep them safe providing warmth, a bed, food, care and veterinary assistance if required. The dogs in our care want for nothing, we go above and beyond to give them the care and socialising they need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Federica Sambiase | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gary Botell | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Worby | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Rosemary Rose | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jay Kershaw | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.97k | £105.81k | £104.97k | £84.63k | £96.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.87k | £86.06k | £81.39k | £79.91k | £98.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Oct 2016 as amended on 08 May 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE AND FOSTER HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DOGS. SPECIFICALLY THE DOBERMANN BREED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yew Tree Farm
Cholmondeley Road
Wrenbury
Cheshire
CW5 8HJ
- Phone:
- 07511869881
- Email:
- info@dobermannrescueuk.co.uk
- Website:
-
Www.dobermannrescueuk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window