THE TUMBLE EISTEDDFOD COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual Eisteddfod where adult, teenagers and children compete by singing, reciting and playing instruments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 31 January 1979: Standard registration
- EISTEDDFOD FLYNYDDOL Y TYMBL (Working name)
- TUMBLE ANNUAL EISTEDDFOD (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RHIAN EVANS | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
CATRIN REES | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
NERIS SAMUEL | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANWEN EVANS | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
DELYTH ARMSTRONG | Trustee |
|
||||||
ERICA SAMUEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BETHAN LLOYD WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWYNFOR JAMES JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET RHION ELIAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAYNOR HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.33k | £0 | £0 | £2.94k | £4.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.26k | £170 | £352 | £3.54k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN WELSH CULTURE INCLUDING THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE PUBLIC TASTE IN THE ARTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION.)
Area of benefit
TUMBLE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
112 HIGH STREET
TUMBLE
LLANELLI
SA14 6HD
- Phone:
- 01269833568
- Email:
- catrinmrees@btinternt.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window