Financial history PLYMOUTH HEARTBEAT

Charity Number: 1168079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £49.21k £64.23k £68.51k £38.27k £57.16k
Total expenditure £50.62k £54.82k £60.81k £62.61k £62.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.41k £27.90k N/A N/A