FOOD RELIEF
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are doing some food related projects within UK aswell as Pakistan. We hope to set up food banks within England. We are also helping with some health projects in Pakistan. In Pakistan we hope to do food projects around the country and we also are helping some hospitals that are currently running and we aim to get involved more with health projects within Pakistan.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 03 November 2016: Standard registration
- 11 April 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN AZAD KASHMIR, PAKISTAN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD PARCELS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window