THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE PRINCESS OF WALES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 508400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund-raising activities Friends POWCH shop in hospital

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £19,532
Total expenditure: £21,862

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 1979: Standard registration
  • 30 October 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BROMSGROVE HOSPITALS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET HARDMAN DODD Chair
None on record
Keren Kesterton Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
RITA SMITH Trustee 12 August 2019
None on record
ELEANOR HANNAH Trustee 12 August 2019
None on record
Gill FREDRICK Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
Gill FLETCHER Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
ALAN BAILEY Trustee 06 July 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £5.97k £8.76k £50 £10.83k £19.53k
Total expenditure £2.96k £18.18k £0 £5.77k £21.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 08 March 2025 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 May 2023 304 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 18 NOVEMBER 1981.
Charitable objects
1)TO RELIVE IN CASES OF NEED EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PATIENTS OR DISCHARGED PATIENTS OF BROMSGROVE COTTAGE HOSPITAL 2)IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR REST AND RECREATION OF THE NURSING STAFF OF THE SAID HOSPITAL WITH THE OBJECT OF ENABLING THEM TO PERFORM THEIR DUTIES MORE EFFICIENTLY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 04 June 1979 : Standard registration
  • 30 October 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
322 OLD BIRMINGHAM ROAD
LICKEY
BIRMINGHAM
B45 8ES
Phone:
01214452209
Website:

No information available