The Forget Me Not's (Crawley)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Forget Me Nots ensure no carer, loved one, friend or family member of someone living with dementia in Crawley and surrounding area would ever feel alone. We exist to provide friendship, help, advice and a hand to hold when needed. We meet twice a week offering lunch and supper, meaningful activities and support for carers within Govenment COVID guidelines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 July 2017: CIO registration
- THE FORGET ME NOTS (Working name)
- THE FORGET ME NOT CLUB (CRAWLEY) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY ELIZABETH WILSON | Chair | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Frederick Hotham | Trustee | 30 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Portal Castro | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALISON BURKE | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLY JEAN LOXSTON-BOWN | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN REMFRY | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.43k | £23.59k | £21.59k | £27.44k | £50.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.46k | £16.49k | £17.30k | £20.41k | £36.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.50k | £5.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Jul 2017 as amended on 25 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CARERS, FAMILY MEMBERS, FRIENDS OR COLLEAGUES OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA IN CRAWLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY: 1) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SAFE SOCIAL INTERACTION, EMOTIONAL AND SOCIAL SUPPORT, THEREBY REDUCING SOCIAL ISOLATION 2) RAISING AWARENESS OF DEMENTIA AMONGST THOSE AFFECTED AND WITH VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS THAT PROVIDE SERVICES FOR THOSE WITH DEMENTIA 3) EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO DEMENTIA AND THEREBY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE SUPPORT AND EDUCATION AVAILABLE TO THOSE AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Clive Way
CRAWLEY
West Sussex
RH10 7AH
- Phone:
- 07486869939
- Email:
- info@theforgetmenots.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window