FULL GOSPEL UNITED PENTECOSTAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we provide group activities to the community, advise, advocacy, marriage, burial, christening. In some cases provide financial assistant to families and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 August 2016: CIO registration
- FULL GOSPEL DELIVERANCE MINISTRIES (UNITED PENTECOSTAL) (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Cabey- Bennett | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Duckett | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROSETTA WILLIAMS CAMPBELL | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARM SERGEANT | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET JENNIFER GEORGE - SPRAGUE | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA KELLY | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.40k | £28.80k | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.40k | £26.53k | £15.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 December 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1286 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 December 2021 | 399 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1651 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Pilgrims Way
LONDON
N19 3UU
- Phone:
- 02070418909
- Email:
- upcogl@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window