IRISH WOLFHOUND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of Irish Wolfhounds in need of care and attention and to promote humane behaviour towards Irish Wolfhounds. To advance the education of the public in matters concerning Irish Wolfhound health and welfare in general, including undertaking research into the same, the useful results of which will be published for the public benefit.?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 2016: CIO registration
- IWCT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Jean Scarlett du Rose | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Porter | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHARON LAKE | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Serena Brownlie | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA SUSAN JOYCE | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.51k | £10.54k | £10.17k | £7.32k | £12.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79k | £2.53k | £1.22k | £5.22k | £941 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF IRISH WOLFHOUNDS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS IRISH WOLFHOUNDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A) PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO IRISH WOLFHOUND RESCUE FACILITIES ESTABLISHED TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF IRISH WOLFHOUNDS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE, TREATMENT AND REHOMING OF SUCH ANIMALS; B) THE PROVISION OF FREE MEDICAL OR SURGICAL TREATMENT, OR SUCH TREATMENT AT REDUCED CHARGES, TO IRISH WOLFHOUNDS BELONGING TO PERSONS WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE SERVICES OF A VETERINARY SURGEON; AND C) OFFERING ADVICE ON RESPONSIBLE OWNERSHIP AND RE-HOMING. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS CONCERNING IRISH WOLFHOUND HEALTH AND WELFARE IN GENERAL, INCLUDING UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE SAME, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadholme House Farm
Broadholme Lane
BELPER
Derbyshire
DE56 2JG
- Phone:
- 07729461813
- Email:
- iwctcontact@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window