THE MORETONHAMPSTEAD BOWRING LIBRARY CHARITABLE TRUST.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity works towards the provision of maintaining the Building and the provision of the library services in the Bowring Library Building
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 31 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Farrand Rogers | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Francis Arnold | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Rooney | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr SEBASTIAN PAYNE | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE BOWES | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|||||
VIVIENNE HODGES | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DURNFORD | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £78 | £79 | £84 | £84 | £84 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 31 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
3.1 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MORETONHAMPSTEAD PARISH AND SURROUNDING AREAS, AND OF VISITORS TO THE TOWN, TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN THE GRADE II LISTED BOWRING LIBRARY BUILDING WITH THE AIM OF CONTRIBUTING TO THE HISTORIC ENVIRONMENT AND THE CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF THE TOWN; AND 3.2 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MORETONHAMPSTEAD PARISH AND SURROUNDING AREAS, AND OF VISITORS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mill House
Drewsteignton
Exeter
EX6 6QE
- Phone:
- 0164724515
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window