Trustees KETTERING AND DISTRICT SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1168021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adrienne Greenbank Trustee 03 July 2024
None on record
Stephen Peter Williamson Trustee 24 October 2023
None on record
Linda Coles Trustee 24 October 2023
None on record
Michael John Payne Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Jeanette Joan Egner Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Sheelagh Morris Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
BILLIE OWEN Trustee 30 April 2022
None on record
RUTH DONEGAN Trustee 30 April 2022
None on record
MARIA KEALEY Trustee 30 April 2022
None on record