BRITISH BLIND SPORT

Charity number: 1168093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

At British Blind Sport, we help blind and partially sighted people get active and play sport. We encourage adults and children to participate in activities at all levels, from grassroots to the Paralympic Games.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 July 2016: Standard registration
  • 11 October 2018: Funds received from 271500 BRITISH BLIND SPORT
  • 15 May 2019: Funds received from 306115 THE TORCH TROPHY TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS SALLY BARKER Chair 01 January 2018
None on record
Louise Assioun Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Mathew Pounder Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Richard Moon Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Adrain Davies Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Joelle Carlton-Conway Trustee 12 April 2022
None on record
Sophie Lois Fairclough Trustee 12 April 2022
None on record
Lauren Myers Trustee 12 February 2020
None on record
David Anthony Gavrilovic Trustee 10 June 2016
BLIND CRICKET ENGLAND AND WALES (BCEW)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £368.61k £320.18k £413.38k £1.01m £624.76k
Total expenditure £371.92k £324.31k £411.57k £958.69k £533.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £156.70k £97.88k £182.43k £420.11k £380.44k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.00m £428.40k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.04k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £7.83k £189.78k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £329 £540
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.00k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £481
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £949.85k £524.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £8.84k £8.85k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.46k £8.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £11.05k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £5.79k £5.40k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £412.03k £457.11k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £173.70k £127.36k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 COVENTRY ROAD
CUBBINGTON
LEAMINGTON SPA
WARWICKSHIRE
CV32 7JN
Phone:
01926424247