Financial history BELMOND MYANMAR FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1169939
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £21.46k £33.41k £14.68k £16.15k £8.61k
Total expenditure £10.08k £41.70k £4.83k £9.39k £26.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A