JUBILEE CHURCH MAIDSTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is simply to be people who are: * Conformed to Christ * Compelled by Love * Changing our World Our mission is to reach and influence the world by making disciples, strengthening churches and empowering people to lead and impact in every sphere of life. Fun, family, making memories and walking on a life journey together are at the heart of Jubilee Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Germany
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- United States
Governance
- 05 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Darling | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Andy Faulkner | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Darren Eagles | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £361.51k | £382.16k | £344.47k | £308.06k | £306.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £360.00k | £334.76k | £318.19k | £394.15k | £200.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES PRINCIPALLY IN THE VACINITY OF KENT, BUT EXTENDING TO NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL WHERE DEEMED NECESSARY BY THE TRUSTEES
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Harrow Way
Weavering
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME14 5TU
- Phone:
- 01622804664
- Email:
- office@jubilee.co
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window