Trustees FOPS (FRIENDS OF PORTFIELDS SCHOOL)

Charity number: 1170036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAYNE ELRICK Chair 20 May 2016
None on record
Kelly Teresa Wilson Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Gemma Anne Bartlett Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Victoria Sara Evans Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Rea Therese Kelly Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
Katherine Jane Alderman Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
Nikki Marshall Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record