FABRIC FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aims are to advance the life and relieve the need of young people who are looked after children, care leavers, care experienced, homeless and asylum seekers through providing; activities, experiences and training, addressing accommodation issues- including the provision of accommodation and support, campaigning for positive change and addressing issues that impact all of these young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 19 August 2016: Standard registration
- FABRIC (Working name)
- FACILITATING ASPIRATIONS BUILDING RESILIENCE INSPIRING CHANGE (Working name)
- FACILITATING ASPIRATIONS BUILDING RESILIENCE INSPIRING CHANGE (Previous name)
- FACILITATING ASPIRATIONS BUILDING RESILIENCE INSPIRING CHANGE LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARRI HELVON-HARDY | Chair | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Junor-Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Harvey | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Palmer | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Perry | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.12k | £43.50k | £113.74k | £37.46k | £58.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.95k | £39.19k | £101.11k | £51.86k | £19.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.90k | £11.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 05 December 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 05 December 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 11 December 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 11 December 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAY 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE ACROSS SOUTH AND WEST WALES THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF SEMI-INDEPENDENT LIVING PROVISION WITH 24 HOUR SUPPORT FOR 16-18 YEAR OLD LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN AND CARE LEAVERS (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Water Street Business Centre
Water Street
Port Talbot
Unit 13
SA12 6LF
- Phone:
- 07904593226
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window