INNOVATION TO INSPIRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Innovation to Inspire Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WAYNE DERBYSHIRE | Chair | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANIL PATEL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEEPAK FARMAH | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/03/2020 | 28/03/2021 | 28/03/2022 | 28/03/2023 | 28/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.55k | £30.28k | £10.08k | £193 | £11.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.54k | £33.41k | £8.50k | £8.22k | £10.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.05k | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SEVERELY DEPRIVED UK REGIONS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, RELIGION, POLITICAL, OR OTHER OPINION. BY SUCH CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT WHO HAVE NOT BEEN ABLE TO GAIN THIS FROM MAINSTREAM EDUCATION OR HAVE CHOSEN A PATH OF CRIME. 3) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF YOUNG PEOPLE (AGES 4-19) WHO HAVE NOT BEEN ABLE TO FIND A FUTURE IN MAINSTREAM EDUCATION OR HAVE CHOSEN A PATH OF CRIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
I2I trust 14- 16 Belgrave Close
COALVILLE
Leicestershire
LE67 4TN
- Phone:
- 07940257772
- Email:
- i2itrust@mail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window