CAMBRIDGE CONVOY REFUGEE ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise volunteers who live in and around Cambridge working to help the refugees in Northern France and elsewhere. We send regular convoys of volunteers to Europe, and we carry out activities in UK to raise awareness of the situation. We raise funds and organise donations of clothing and other items. All the money we raise goes towards providing aid to the refugees or supporting our convoys.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
268 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
Governance
- 15 November 2016: CIO registration
- CAMCRAG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ian Christopher Tod | Chair | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elena Pascal | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Birgit Federle | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tugba Basaran | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Karam Alkatlabe | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Stephan | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Tony Richard King | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Lucy Walston | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Edward Thomas Sexton | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TERRY NEIL SPENCER MSc,MICE | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.91k | £25.48k | £52.59k | £47.28k | £34.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.38k | £9.65k | £43.55k | £56.57k | £38.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND OTHER MIGRANTS IN NEED BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE FACILITIES, FOOD, WATER, SHELTER AND CLOTHING. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN REFUGEE CAMPS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND RESOURCES FOR EDUCATION. 3) THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) IN PARTICULAR AMONG REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: •MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; •OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; •CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; AND •RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
co Cambridge Ethnic Community Forum
16-18 Arbury Court
CAMBRIDGE
CB42JQ
- Phone:
- 07758628734
- Email:
- treasurer@camcrag.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window