NORTH WALES SHEEPDOG SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publishing a diary of sheepdog trials in the area and arranging trials for members to compete. Providing a website and social media platforms to posts news, details of upcoming events and results. Promoting responsible sheepdog ownership, breeding, training and improvement. Further the knowledge and appreciation of sheepdogs and sheep farming through education, meetings and sheepdog trials
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Powys
- Wrexham
Governance
- 08 March 1979: Standard registration
- 22 December 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 December 2021: Funds transferred to 1193729 NORTH WALES SHEEP DOG SOCIETY (NWSDS)
- NORTH WALES SHEEP DOG SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.44k | £6.13k | £16.44k | £5.31k | £8.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.26k | £4.10k | £13.42k | £6.51k | £6.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 11 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 DECEMBER 1965, AS REVISED 15 FEBRUARY 1978. as amended on 06 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE AND FOSTER, WITHIN NORTH WALES, THE BREEDING, TRAINING AND IMPROVEMENT OF SHEEPDOGS, THUS SECURING THE BETTER MANAGEMENT OF SHEEP STOCK ON HILL AND LOW LAND FARMS AND BY EDUCATION, MEETINGS AND TRIALS, TO FURTHER THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SHEEP DOGS AND SHEEP FARMING.
Area of benefit
NORTH WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window