WHITTINGTON MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity Number: 1168989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote public appreciation of and education in classical music in and around Whittington, Oswestry, in particular by organising chamber music festivals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £56,976
Total expenditure: £44,754

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 September 2016: CIO registration
  • 21 February 2017: Funds received from 1157673 WHITTINGTON MUSIC FESTIVAL
  • 22 February 2017: Funds received from 1157673 WHITTINGTON MUSIC FESTIVAL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Marion Judith Greaves Chair 05 April 2024
None on record
Oliver Davies Trustee 03 April 2025
None on record
Melanie Jane Hadwick Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Ursula Frances Neil Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Patricia Anne Lowe Trustee 08 December 2023
None on record
RACHEL ADRIENNE PITTAWAY Trustee 15 June 2023
SHROPSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Debra Jane Lumley-Edwards Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Helen Mary Hughes Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Maria Nichola Hollis Trustee 07 May 2021
None on record
Pamela Lynn Parish Trustee 15 January 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £24.70k £1.94k £25.33k £56.73k £56.98k
Total expenditure £10.09k £16.93k £37.09k £44.56k £44.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £200 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £150 £200 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 11 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 12 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 03 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 10 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ashfield
Bronygarth
OSWESTRY
Shropshire
SY10 7LY
Phone:
07902815287